BRIGHT CENTRES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ENABLE STUDENTS TO ACHIEVE HIGH LEVELS OF ACADEMIC SUCCESS IN THEIR REGULAR SCHOOLING. TO REDUCE THE EXCLUSIONS OF DISADVANTAGE YOUNG PEOPLE. TUITION FOR ENGLISH, MATHS AND SCIENCE LESSONS AS WELL AS INDIVIDUAL MENTORING AND ENRICHMENT OPPORTUNITIES. TO BUILD THE CAPACITY OF PARENTS THROUGH ADULT LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES AND BY ENCOURAGING THEIR INVOLVEMENT IN THE EDUCATION OF THEIR CHILDREN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £40,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brent
- Camden
- Lambeth
- Southwark
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 22 April 2009: Standard registration
- 09 June 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 November 2014: Re-registered
- BEC (Working name)
- BRIGHT EDUCATION CENTRE (Previous name)
- BRIGHT EDUCATION CENTRES LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Brindley | Chair | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Liban Elmi | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yazeed Muawia Elbedawi Hamad | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Muna Ibrahim | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.01k | £92.25k | £99.57k | £125.75k | £102.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.67k | £126.52k | £115.92k | £145.87k | £114.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.50k | £8.75k | N/A | £66.75k | £40.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED 6 APRIL 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM ETHNIC MINORITY GROUPS AND THEIR PARENTS IN LONDON IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1) PROVIDING EXTRACURRICULAR SUPPORT IN ENGLISH, MATHEMATICS AND SCIENCE; 2) PROVIDING A PEER-MENTORING PROGRAMME; AND 3) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND INFORMATION TO PARENTS IN THE NATIONAL CURRICULUM AND HOME SCHOOL AGREEMENTS.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bright Centres
18 Oakden Street
LONDON
SE11 4UG
- Phone:
- 02030049782
- Email:
- info@brightcentres.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window