POTTER'S HOUSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP CHURCH (KINGSTON UPON THAMES)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Charity is a local Church in Royal London Borough of Kingston Upon Thames. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH THE PREACHING OF THE GOSPEL IN OUR LOCAL AREA. WE AIM TO REACH ALL PEOPLE THROUGH FREE MUSIC CONCERTS, DRAMAS AND OTHER FREE ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 18 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 September 2011: Re-registered
- 09 June 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE DOOR (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.11k | £5.00k | £9.09k | £13.97k | £27.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.22k | £4.79k | £8.02k | £13.30k | £24.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 30 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 29 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED IN AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY REGARDLESS OF NATIONALITY, RELIGIOUS POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION IN THE SAID (COUNTY) AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window