OUTDOORLADS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EACH MONTH WE RUN A WIDE RANGE OF ACTIVITIES IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO THE, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANSSEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER COMMUNITIES. FROM CAMPING, HOSTELLING, HILLWALKING AND INDOOR CLIMBING, TO THE MORE EXTREME ACTIVITIES LIKE GORGE SCRAMBLING, ICE CLIMBING, TECHNICAL MOUNTAIN BIKING AND MANY MORE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
420 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 December 2009: Standard registration
- OUTDOORLADS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM MICHAEL ALLAWAY | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart William Innes | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Anthony Blackman | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Anthony Blackwell | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ian Mitchell | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Ryan Bailey | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £273.93k | £132.31k | £361.90k | £360.96k | £353.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £306.05k | £139.32k | £208.93k | £337.46k | £350.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.76k | £11.32k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/10/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22/09/2012 as amended on 21 Sep 2019 as amended on 21 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANSSEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER COMMUNITIES, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, THE LOCAL AND THE PUBLIC AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION IN RELATION TO GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANSSEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER PERSONS BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS OF ISSUES AFFECTING SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
OutdoorLads
440 Royal Exchange
MANCHESTER
M2 7EP
- Phone:
- 0161 4200001
- Email:
- support@outdoorlads.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window