THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARD'S, LEXDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Regular public worship open to all. - The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. - Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. - Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. - Promoting the mission of the Church through activities for senior citizens & parents and toddlers. - Supporting other charities in UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 27 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- LEXDEN PCC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Matthew Jonathan SIMPKINS | Chair | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Christine Fordham | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Anne Firth | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Allston | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Firth | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Allston | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Yvonne Cleverdon | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Frances Hinchcliffe | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Marguerite Watkins | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David John Burrows | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Margaret Frances Telford Whiteman | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE GAIL ROMAIN | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ALAN WATKINS | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev VIVIEN EVELYN MENDHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Adrian Steward | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH ANNE STEELE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE VIOLET MESSINGER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.54k | £118.16k | £214.77k | £133.35k | £153.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £171.38k | £160.01k | £146.82k | £172.41k | £197.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Leonards Church
Lexden Road
Colchester
CO3 4BL
- Phone:
- 01206 575565
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window