NOW I EAT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Now I Eat is a voluntary organisation which assists young disadvantaged children in India, Sri Lanka and China, who do not have access to education, healthcare and nutritional diet. Its aim is to open future doors for these people in the world of work by improving their health and by providing them a decent education. Where practicable, we will also assist vunerable groups including the elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- China
- India
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 02 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Parma Nand | Chair | 28 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
KISHAN LAL | Trustee | 28 February 2015 |
|
|||||
BALDEV RAJ KOROTANIA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20 | £5 | £8 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15 | £1 | £1 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 19 JANUARY 2009 AS AMENDED 6 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN INDIA AND CHINA BY: I THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION II THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS III THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH
Area of benefit
INDIA AND CHINA
Contact information
- Address:
-
7B HOLLY BUSH LANE
HAMPTON
TW12 2QR
- Phone:
- 08454309308
- Email:
- nowieat@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window