Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, HILLINGDON
Charity number: 1128058

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew James Szurgot | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ursulyn Marita George | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mildred Ruth Akullo-Ogwal | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Humphrey George | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROL WILLIAMS | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Nicholas Clevett | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roy Arthur Munday | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
THE REVD ALAN BRADFORD | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|||||
KENNETH RIDLEY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
|||||
RACHEL LUCY PIKE | Trustee | 31 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.