THE METHODIST CHURCH SHEFFIELD SOUTH CIRCUIT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the activities of the 11 churches in the Sheffield South Circuit by providing information, guidance and support through providing ministers, training and resources. Sheffield South Circuit operates in the South of Sheffield and in North East Derbyshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2013
Total income:
£601,077
Donations and legacies | £1.79k | |
Charitable activities | £78.52k | |
Other trading activities | £517.00k | |
Investments | £1.75k | |
Other | £2.02k |
Total expenditure:
£439,591
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £94.93k | |
Other | £4.69k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £344.66k | |
Charitable expenditure | £94.93k | |
Retained for future use | £161.49k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 11 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 14 August 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 14 August 2014: Funds transferred to 1134151 SHEFFIELD METHODIST CIRCUIT
- SHEFFIELD SOUTH METHODIST CIRCUIT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.66k | £134.09k | £120.32k | £601.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.96k | £132.33k | £143.43k | £439.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.79k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £517.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £78.52k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.75k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.02k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £94.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £339.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.69k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £200.88k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 27 March 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 27 March 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 21 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 21 March 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 01 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 01 February 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 14 February 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 14 February 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window