THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARY OATLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £5,950 from 2 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 21 September 2022: Funds received from 1049088 OATLANDS SINGERS
- SAINT MARY OATLANDS PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Stephen Ashworth | Chair | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Asha Jadav | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ruth Miseldine | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Diab Farhan Haddad | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Blake Clatworthy | Trustee | 10 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Evans | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Esther Tinson | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Alfred Brown | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Rachel Bainbridge | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julian Sergeant | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Davies | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Joan Stickland | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Rodney Montgomerie | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN THOMAS STICKLAND | Trustee | 12 April 2014 |
|
|||||
ANNE MARIE VRIONIDES | Trustee | 09 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.42k | £172.95k | £238.08k | £188.07k | £183.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £246.65k | £200.23k | £264.96k | £189.54k | £221.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.51k | N/A | £17.00k | N/A | £5.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys Church
Oatlands Avenue
Weybridge
Surrey
KT13 9TS
- Phone:
- 01932 231274
- Email:
- BRIAN@STICKLANDS.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window