White Bridge PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PTA holding various activities to provide funding for the school to enable them to purchase additional equipment and activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 07 April 2009: Standard registration
- WBSA (Previous name)
- WHITE BRIDGE SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Paul Lyons | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Helen Richardson | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jack Charles Legon | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sybella Graves-Morris | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Freya Emmie Prater | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Benjamin Bebb-Sier | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Miller | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Vidal Basols | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ananda Ida Griffith Bougouin | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Cartwright | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.47k | £6.96k | £7.06k | £31.14k | £24.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.16k | £30.15k | £4.23k | £24.55k | £27.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 21 April 2024 | 115 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JANUARY 2009 as amended on 11 Jul 2019 as amended on 12 May 2022 as amended on 12 May 2022
Charitable objects
To advance the education of pupils in the School in particular by: Developing effective relationships between the staff parents and others associated with the school; Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the School and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The White Bridge Community Primary School
Greensted Road
LOUGHTON
Essex
IG10 3DR
- Phone:
- 07956167958
- Email:
- Whitebridgepta@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window