PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BRAMLEY, GUILDFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The normal activities of a Church of England Parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 18 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- HOLY TRINITY BRAMLEY PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Oldrey | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Mintz | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan O'Connell | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Williams | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jill Mussett | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Gates | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.50k | £99.64k | £110.27k | £105.43k | £122.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.70k | £109.18k | £91.69k | £121.91k | £231.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £14.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity Church
High Street
Bramley
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU5 0HD
- Phone:
- 01483890042
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window