THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST AUGUSTINE'S WITH ST LUKE’S , BROMLEY COMMON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all and the provision of sacred space. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools, provision of a youth club. Promoting the whole mission of the Church with activities for senior citizens, toddlers etc. Supporting other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bromley
Governance
- 01 May 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST AUGUSTINE'S PCC, BROMLEY COMMON (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST AUGUSTINE, BROMLEY COMMON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rebecca Charlotte Emma Willoughby | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Christine Ruth Regas | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Pope | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeffery Blyth | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Murray | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christian Major | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Edward Fyfield | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Spencer | Trustee | 02 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frances Hilary Chittock | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL HOWARD POPE | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WILLIAM GORMAN | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Bryce Mitchell | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Joy Gurney | Trustee | 12 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.28k | £161.53k | £197.10k | £194.16k | £215.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.77k | £172.56k | £183.33k | £234.69k | £219.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
24 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES as amended on 21 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Augustines Parish Church
Southborough Lane
BROMLEY
BR2 8AT
- Phone:
- 020 8295 1550
- Email:
- office@st-augustines.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window