Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST AUGUSTINE'S WITH ST LUKE’S , BROMLEY COMMON
Charity number: 1129375

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rebecca Charlotte Emma Willoughby | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Christine Ruth Regas | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Pope | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeffery Blyth | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Murray | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christian Major | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Edward Fyfield | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Spencer | Trustee | 02 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frances Hilary Chittock | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL HOWARD POPE | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WILLIAM GORMAN | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Bryce Mitchell | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Joy Gurney | Trustee | 12 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.