HIGH STREET BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal Purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
- Israel
Governance
- 17 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Jane Inns | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Layne-Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Scott Cave | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nandi Rebecca Hall | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Margaret Passmore | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ruth Helen Mary Egan | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joseph Bernard Egan | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Law | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Louise Rowland | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN ROGERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.62k | £127.60k | £115.43k | £114.99k | £122.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.74k | £108.32k | £118.88k | £117.81k | £112.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JANUARY 2009 as amended on 24 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGH STREET BAPTIST CHURCH
89 HIGH STREET
TRING
HP23 4AB
- Phone:
- 01442 824054
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window