WILMSLOW METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public acts of worship open to all. Teach Christianity via sermons, courses, small groups and religious assemblies in schools. Pastoral work e.g. visiting the sick and bereaved. Promote Christianity through the staging of events and services, clubs and meetings with a Christian ethos. Support other charities financially and with prayer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

20 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Manchester City
- Stockport
Governance
- 07 May 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ian Smart | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Howard Wyn Evans | Trustee | 16 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Barlow | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Rosemary Thompson | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ekaete Efretuei | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Dean | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Lynette Tonks | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Wood | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Jean Welton | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Bourne | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER VAUX COWARD | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Margaret Bateson Evans | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Maria Coe BSc, PhD | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Kennedy | Trustee | 19 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
GWYNETH HOLT | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
AVRIL MARY TUCKER BENG | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS JENNY DEVERELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN HOUGHTON BA ALCM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE CHRISTINE HASSELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ian Douglas Kennedy | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.72k | £95.28k | £229.06k | £188.28k | £106.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.24k | £98.66k | £241.71k | £223.78k | £101.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wilmslow Methodist Church
Water Lane
WILMSLOW
SK9 5AR
- Phone:
- 01625 528892
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window