THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN-AT-HAMPSTEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship. Teaching of Christianity. Sunday schools. Provision of religious assemblies at and for schools. Pastoral work including visiting sick and bereaved. Provision of space for personal prayer and contemplation, and for public performance of literary, musical and dramatic works of a predominantly Christian character. Supporting other UK and overseas charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
Governance
- 22 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 12 May 2021: Funds received from 1010794 HAMPSTEAD COUNSELLING SERVICE
- HAMPSTEAD PARISH CHURCH, HAMPSTEAD PCC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Mary Ford | Chair | 21 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
Helen Taylor | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
Toba Fatimilehin | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
James Poletyllo | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Nicholas White | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Jules Lubbock | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Jessica Harland | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
SHEENA GINNINGS | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
HAGAR CLIFF | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Sarah Cheriton-Jones | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Martin Wigley Evans | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Jonathan Michael Davey | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
NICHOLAS MARTIN WALSER | Trustee | 06 April 2011 |
|
|||||||||||||
ELIZABETH JANE BEESLEY | Trustee | 06 April 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||
ANGELA MARY GARDNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
Inigo Rodney Milman Woolf | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
Dr HANDLEY MICHAEL GAMBRELL STEVENS MA, PhD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
ROSEMARY ANNE LOYD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
GAYNOR ANTHIGA BASSEY-FISH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £457.64k | £513.03k | £386.53k | £387.04k | £404.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £519.71k | £470.55k | £387.03k | £379.96k | £466.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £435.07k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £22.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £54.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £101.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £451.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £19.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £63.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH ROW
LONDON
NW3 6UU
- Phone:
- 020 7794 5808
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window