CENTRAL,DERBY,UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the church are worship, promotion of the gospel, pastoral care and community support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derby City
Governance
- 14 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CENTRAL UNITED REFORMED CHURCH /CENTRAL URC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Barling Mrs | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Frances Orchard | Trustee | 20 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Elizabeth Hinchliffe | Trustee | 20 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Charles Michael Goodman | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Gould | Trustee | 16 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE JOYCE FIELDING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £657.43k | £178.44k | £134.54k | £130.62k | £119.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £473.91k | £490.23k | £149.23k | £206.38k | £145.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £55.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £30.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £10.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £12.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £547.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £436.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £5.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £37.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH ACTS (1972 AND 1981) AND SCHEME OF UNION (1972) 01/01/1973
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity is the advancement of the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the Scheme of Union of the United Reformed Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
STUART HOUSE
GREEN LANE
DERBY
DE1 1RS
- Phone:
- 01332514631
- Email:
- sec@centralurcderby.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window