PAUL'S CANCER SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to: - provide information, support, education & complementary therapies to people whose lives have been touched by cancer, recognising and respecting their individual needs; - reach all sections of the community - encourage the users of our service to give feedback on our services and to be actively involved in the Centre's work; - advance health through health promotion work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 February 2009: Standard registration
- PAUL'S CANCER SUPPORT CENTRE (Working name)
- PAUL D'AURIA CANCER SUPPORT CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Anne Bunting | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerena Alison Richards | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Chrisoph Durst | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Cox MVO | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £283.56k | £270.04k | £276.54k | £309.44k | £206.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £244.50k | £275.92k | £291.41k | £237.88k | £234.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.80k | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/01/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/12/2012 as amended on 18 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND PROVIDE INFORMATION, SUPPORT, THERAPIES AND EDUCATION TO PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
F R P ADVISORY LLP
110 CANNON STREET
LONDON
EC4N 6EU
- Phone:
- 01642917559
- Website:
-
WWW.FRPADVISORY.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window