WEST BRIDGFORD METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of regular public acts of worship. Provision of a sacred space for prayer & contemplation. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses & small groups. Pastoral work. Provision of youth club,women's meeting etc with a Christian ethos. Promoting whole mission of the church through activities for older people,parents & toddlers & other specific need groups. Supporting other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 03 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Lewin | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
CHARLES RAYNER | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
HUGH VANNER CRAWFORD | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
IRENE MARGARET MILBURN | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
KAREN DIANE HOBDELL | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
AUDREY NICHOLSON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
SHARON ANANDHI HARRIS | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
SANDRA MORREY | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
CHRIS MORREY | Trustee | 07 March 2013 |
|
|||||||
JOHN HOWARD THURSTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
STEVE NICHOLSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JANINE RAYNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARCIA CORINNE SIEFKEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
YIN KHOW MELLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MONICA ELIZABETH HEARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN DAVID HEARD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £199.92k | £157.88k | £140.81k | £185.00k | £206.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.42k | £191.71k | £158.60k | £171.22k | £180.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Saunton Close
Edwalton
Nottingham
NG12 4FE
- Phone:
- 01159231092
- Email:
- ccsec@wbmethodist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window