THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT JOHN FARNCOMBE

Charity Number: 1129632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses, groups, school assemblies and after school club. Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events, meetings, distributing literature and activities for special need groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £147,333
Total expenditure: £160,101

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 May 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • Farncombe PCC (Working name)
  • ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, FARNCOMBE PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV JAMES RATTUE Chair
HENRY SMITH
Received: On time
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF HENRY SMITH
Received: On time
FARNCOMBE IN GODALMING CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
FARNCOMBE INFANTS TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Natalie Anne Roberts Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Jaqueline Ann Butcher Trustee 22 May 2021
None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Coote Trustee 22 May 2021
None on record
Geoffrey Coote Trustee 22 May 2021
FARNCOMBE IN GODALMING CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
Philippa Mary Dearsley Trustee 22 May 2021
None on record
Jane Valoy Jopson Trustee 22 May 2021
None on record
Susan Dorothy Petty Trustee 27 April 2019
None on record
Shirley Isabel Martin Trustee 27 April 2019
None on record
Graeme John Pullen Trustee 27 April 2019
None on record
Jenny Downes Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Helen Elizabeth Gee Trustee 16 April 2017
THE GODALMING CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
FARNCOMBE IN GODALMING CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
MARJORIE MARY CAWLEY Trustee 27 April 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £138.43k £112.70k £120.52k £141.92k £147.33k
Total expenditure £142.65k £131.86k £124.71k £136.52k £160.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.93k £2.99k £2.20k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
38 FARNCOMBE HILL
GODALMING
GU7 2AU
Phone:
01483860709