GATOR AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising a club where young persons are taken from street corners and taught self control and discipline mainly through the sport of Amateur Boxing, wether it be as actual boxers, officials or volunteer helpers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Redbridge
Governance
- 15 September 2009: Standard registration
- GATOR ABC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH MARKHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ramez Mahmood | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
MR E GOREHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.54k | £41.02k | £41.84k | £10.24k | £22.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.45k | £17.41k | £26.03k | £24.75k | £26.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.73k | £25.43k | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 January 2025 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 February 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 December 2021 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 December 2021 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT AND PURPOSE OF THE CLUB IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF THE SPORT OF BOXING, AND RELATED HEALTHY PHYSICAL ACTIVITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
104 Glenwood Gardens
ILFORD
Essex
IG2 6XX
- Phone:
- 02085085936
- Email:
- TGOREHAM@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window