HEATON MOOR EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities for all ages are undertaken with the aim of showing the love of Jesus Christ to all who come and providing an opportunity to present the message of the Gospel, through conversations or formal presentations. Activities include: Sunday services, parent & toddler groups, children and youth groups, women's and men's meetings, seniors' meetings, occasional training courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £1,980 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
- Stockport
Governance
- 12 May 2009: Standard registration
- EMMANUEL COMMUNITY CHURCH STOCKPORT (Working name)
- HMEC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Ingram | Chair | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Watkins | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Cooper | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael Johnson | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
SIMON FORMAN | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP SLACK | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAKOB ALBERT VAN DEN BERG | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIMON J COOK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.77k | £232.74k | £242.80k | £213.80k | £205.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £196.57k | £192.60k | £242.78k | £202.10k | £237.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 FEBRUARY 1972, AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 10 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD AS CARRIED ON BY HEATON MOOR EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 GREEN LANE
STOCKPORT
SK4 3LH
- Phone:
- 01614315176
- Email:
- office@emmanuelcc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window