THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN AND ST MARY, CHUDLEIGH

Charity Number: 1128947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Chudleigh PCC has the responsibility for co-operating with the incumbent, in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £141,538
Total expenditure: £100,308

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • PCC OF CHUDLEIGH PARISH CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Jones Trustee 02 May 2024
None on record
Lucy Monica Kerr Trustee 07 September 2023
None on record
Hayley Elaine Jones Trustee 12 June 2023
None on record
Philippa Ruth Low Trustee 04 May 2023
FIRST CHUDLEIGH SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Rachel Elizabeth Tuckett Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
Rev Alexander Mark Sharp Trustee 08 September 2021
TRUSHAM CAUSLEY FUND
Received: On time
Margaret Kiddle Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
CLIFFORD PAUL BARNES Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
David Henry Bone Trustee 06 May 2015
None on record
CLARE WINIFRED LILLINGTON Trustee 30 November 2014
LADY LUCIE REYNELL'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ALISON LOUISE PHILLIPS Trustee 16 July 2012
None on record
NICOLA JEAN OVER Trustee
None on record
MARGARET ANN PARSONS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £443.19k £112.69k £101.42k £139.52k £141.54k
Total expenditure £124.96k £96.18k £105.85k £109.27k £100.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RADDON
STATION HILL
CHUDLEIGH
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ13 0EE
Phone:
01626852155