Trustees ST ANNE'S-ON-SEA UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Charity Number: 1128043

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Melvin | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
May Bishop | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Patricia Howarth | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Garfitt | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Margaret Dell | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David E Croall | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Phair | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Phair | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.