Accounts and annual returns PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF GHANA, CALVARY CONGREGATION, LONDON

Charity number: 1129937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 23 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 23 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 23 August 2024 328 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 23 August 2024 328 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 10 July 2023 283 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 01 February 2022 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 01 February 2022 124 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 23 October 2020 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 23 October 2020 23 days late Download Open in new window