FUSION PLUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fusion Plus provide music making activities for young people who might not otherwise have the opportunity. We aim to access and engage young people through music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 16 March 2009: Standard registration
- MUSIC FUSION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Buchan | Chair | 08 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robyn Collett | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Loader | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Barton | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Tait | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR WEST-THOMAS | Trustee | 12 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
IAN PIPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.03k | £96.39k | £150.24k | £172.68k | £166.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.39k | £122.85k | £168.90k | £141.06k | £144.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £41.61k | N/A | £18.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF MUSIC AND RELATED ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS 2 TO ADVANCE THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF MUSIC FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ASSIST YOUNG PEOPLE, IN MUSIC AND RELATED ARTS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAVANT ARTS CENTRE
OLD TOWN HALL
56 EAST STREET
HAVANT
PO9 1BS
- Phone:
- 02392492373
- Email:
- info@musicfusion.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window