U SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of sporting, leisure and cultural tickets for children in the UK who are disabled, deprived, disadvantaged or have life limiting conditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
Governance
- 27 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Mark Young | Chair | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Amy Gregory | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Chris Knight | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ADAM LEA GREGORY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TRACEY ANNE GREGORY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.35k | £31.65k | £9.10k | £15.51k | £17.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.84k | £14.03k | £76.13k | £64.37k | £19.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.24k | N/A | £8.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 July 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UK WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISABILITIES AND/OR ARE AFFECTED BY OR SUFFERING FROM SERIOUS ILLNESSES, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING GRANTS FOR DAYS OUT TO SPORTING EVENTS AND OTHER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
U Support
Unit 11
Marlands Shopping Centre
Civic Centre Road
SOUTHAMPTON
SO14 7SJ
- Phone:
- 02380332866
- Email:
- ADAM@USUPPORT.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window