THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH VIRGINIA WATER

Charity Number: 1128275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Christ Church Parochial Church Council has the responsibility of promoting the whole mission of the Church - pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It also has oversight of the financial affairs of Christ Church Virginia Water and maintenance responsibilities for the buildings.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,085,561
Total expenditure: £515,931

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • CHRIST CHURCH VIRGINIA WATER PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Simon David Newman Vibert Dr Chair 18 September 2017
BIBLE BY THE BEACH
Received: On time
Beverley Jane Gilbert Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Steve Payne Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Helen Paula Hall Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Kathleen Blain Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Dr Margaret Perkins Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Ben Parker Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
David Thomas Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Rev Matthew Smith Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
Roger Andew Blain Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Benjamin David James Stannard Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Pamela Julie Unwin BA HONS Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Akeel Husein Kurban Sachak Trustee 18 October 2020
500k International
Received: On time
Rodney John Whitehead Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Rev Jeremy Wallace Brown Trustee 04 September 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £674.40k £443.77k £437.84k £442.28k £1.09m
Total expenditure £566.79k £426.92k £456.92k £424.42k £515.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.88k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £619.13k N/A N/A N/A £1.04m
Income - Other trading activities £15.28k N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £25.17k N/A N/A N/A £34.24k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £1.73k N/A N/A N/A £8.72k
Income - Other £13.10k N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £7.50k N/A N/A N/A £625.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £566.79k N/A N/A N/A £380.92k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A £95
Expenditure - Governance £2.46k N/A N/A N/A £2.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £68.26k N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £247.93k N/A N/A N/A £273.12k
Long-term investments £0 N/A N/A N/A £690.00k
Other assets £300.48k N/A N/A N/A £192.52k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities £10.54k N/A N/A N/A £26.81k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHRIST CHURCH
CHRISTCHURCH ROAD
VIRGINIA WATER
GU25 4PT
Phone:
01344844946