Trustees Buckingham Parish Church
Charity number: 1128704

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Will PEARSON-GEE | Chair | 06 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
George Onaya | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glynnis Eastwood | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Morrell | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Roskell | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Pallett Mr | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Collinson Mr | Trustee | 17 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gerry Causer | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gibson | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Leigh Jeremy | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Roskell | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ian Farquharson Miscampbell | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Piper | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Harry Martin Fairland Morten | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Roskell | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MIKE EVANS | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.