THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, LITTLE SHELFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTING THE EVANGELISTIC AND PASTORAL MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 14 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS LITTLE SHELFORD PCC (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clive Lawrence Ayling | Chair | 07 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Gideon Emmanuel | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Nye | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bewes | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Catherwood | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Justin John Laidlaw Cross | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy Holroyd Glauert | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek John Fraser | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Law | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Joanna Button | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Jean Halliday | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
NEIL WADE | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BROCK | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev SIMON JAMES SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £243.14k | £254.91k | £265.65k | £265.21k | £284.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £273.21k | £237.10k | £272.13k | £267.51k | £267.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 August 2024 | 276 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 August 2024 | 276 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church
Church Street
Little Shelford
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 5HG
- Phone:
- 01223847815
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window