Accounts and annual returns BETHEL HOUSE OF GOD

Charity number: 1128268
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 September 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 April 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On Time