THE WARRANT OFFICERS AND SENIOR RATES' MESS, HMS DRAKE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To have resources available for expenditure on improvements to the qualit of life, and the engenderment of of espirit de corps
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 April 2009: Standard registration
- WO & SR MESS HMS DRAKE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brigadier Michael John Tanner | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £301.53k | £94.67k | £317.78k | £428.06k | £330.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £297.73k | £98.26k | £310.93k | £482.60k | £308.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 10 FEB 2009
Charitable objects
The charity's object (the object) is 'the promotion of efficiency of the armed forces of the Crown by the provision and support of facilities and activities for the efficiency and well-being of service personnel'.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FINANCIAL ADMINISTRATOR
WO & SR MESS
HMS DRAKE
DEVONPORT
PLYMOUTH
PL2 2BG
- Phone:
- 01752555822
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window