THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KNAPHILL WITH BROOKWOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship; providing sacred space for prayer; pastoral work; teaching of Christianity; religious assemblies in schools; youth work with Christian ethos; promotion of Christianity through events & meetings; promoting whole mission of the Church through activities for senior citizens, parents & toddlers, children & other special needs groups; supporting other UK & overseas charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £450 from 1 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 05 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- HOLY TRINITY KNAPHILL & ST SAVIOUR'S BROOKWOOD PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Neil James Hopkins | Chair | 07 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Michelle Louise Slater | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Christopher Huggett | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Margaret Gale | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Nicola Moses | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Parsons | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dawn Lucas-Brown | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Tyas | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Mary Webster | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Peter Veness | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Anne Tisdall OBE | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Jonathan Halls | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Lee Grieve | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jon Robert Darley | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN BAILEY | Trustee | 12 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Christina Joanne Hunt | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev JULIE LEVETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £333.04k | £260.42k | £299.68k | £346.23k | £308.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £279.14k | £304.74k | £244.50k | £297.43k | £310.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.30k | £450 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity Church
Chobham Rd
Knaphill
Woking
GU21 2SX
- Phone:
- 01483473489
- Email:
- welcome@htandstschurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window