THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WISLEY WITH PYRFORD

Charity number: 1128605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • PARISH OF WISLEY WITH PYRFORD (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Nicholas Paul Hutchinson BA PGCE Trustee 28 November 2024
THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS' AND WISLEY CHURCHES
Received: On time
CHARLES DANIEL GIBSON Trustee 01 May 2024
THE KRIKORIAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Roger Charles Holt Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Caroline Oldroyd Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
James Edward Biggs Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Joanna Elizabeth Clayton Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
ALISON JAYNE INGRAM Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Linda Frances Knowles Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Julia Pauline Lamaison Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Edward Graham St John Brockman Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Leslie Ronald Smith Trustee 24 April 2023
LETS READ LTD
Received: On time
THE NAZARETH WAY CIO
Received: On time
CAMILLA SIGLINDE DAGMAR NICHOLLS-WILSON Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
SARAH JANE DALY Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
PENELOPE HOSKYN Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
SUZANNE LEES-SMITH Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
Rev DIANE DAVIDSON Trustee 26 October 2020
None on record
JEREMY CHARLES WILIAM GIDMAN Trustee 26 October 2020
None on record
PAULINE MARGARET LANGFIELD Trustee 26 October 2020
None on record
Claire Victoria Clough Trustee 26 October 2020
ACCESS ACCOUNTANCY
Received: 26 days late
ANTHONY WILLIAM BLIGH Trustee 26 October 2020
None on record
CLAIRE ELIZABETH JANE WILLIAMS Trustee 26 October 2020
None on record
ANDY PEARCE Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record
DR Matthew John Ryan Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £473.48k £485.15k £371.28k £468.62k £518.72k
Total expenditure £465.30k £433.78k £411.31k £480.16k £475.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.11k £2.88k £2.14k £2.26k £1.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £378.89k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £33.62k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £73.49k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £29.53k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.20k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £47.10k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £32.01k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £46.60k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £396.39k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £18.65k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £411.55k
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £142.46k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £46.68k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 06 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 22 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Church Of The Good Shepherd
Coldharbour Road
WOKING
Surrey
GU22 8SP
Phone:
01932346345