THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SHALFORD IN THE DIOCESE OF GUILDFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An active Anglican parish church in the Church of England, with our Christian mission and ministry focused on serving God, serving all in the parish of Shalford and Peasmarsh, and globally, and in our stewardship for all creation. Opening spaces for all who seek to find/deepen their relationship with God. Activities focus around 5 areas: Prayer, Discipleship, Hospitality, Loving Service, Joy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 09 September 2022: Funds received from 1139743 SHALFORD CHORAL SOCIETY
- SHALFORD PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sarah Jane Lloyd | Chair | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Anne Cox | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janette Allardyce Barklem | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
IAN ANTHONY FARR | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolynne Spooner | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Hughes | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Maureen Pickering | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ingrid Davies | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Jane Emily Morris | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Walwyn Thomas | Trustee | 07 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Patricia Hyde | Trustee | 07 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hood Odell | Trustee | 07 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN THOMAS SIMPSON | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.17k | £86.70k | £92.29k | £105.43k | £125.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.67k | £132.28k | £168.88k | £171.62k | £162.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.06k | £3.46k | £1.01k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Close
Shalford
Guildford
Surrey
GU4 8BP
- Phone:
- 01483571646
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window