Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY AND HOLY TRINITY, BOW (WITH BROMLEY SAINT LEONARD)

Charity number: 1130902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £281.19k £314.23k £146.51k £134.43k £170.40k
Total expenditure £91.13k £403.83k £181.31k £195.35k £191.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A