Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY AND HOLY TRINITY, BOW (WITH BROMLEY SAINT LEONARD)
Charity number: 1130902

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Selvendran | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Olsworth-Peter | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rozalie James | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beatrix Brown | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Mathew | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Moore | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Davidson | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Cheevers | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Hughes | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Rider | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amanda Claremont | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Olivette Cole-Wilson | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chrystabel Austin | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Nicholls | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.