THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, WOODFORD BRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities appropriate to the purpose and mission of an Anglican parish. Provision of meeting space for local groups and organisations. Provision of services related to the Christian context of the parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Redbridge
Governance
- 10 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST PAUL'S PCC,WOODFORD BRIDGE (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alexandra Frances Grace Podd | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Reginald Fulcher | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Antonia Armero Salido | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Lascelles | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Kenneth Frost | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Squadron Leader Alan Raymond Dudley Clark | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Maureen Malam | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nathaniel Gary Oliver Ayres | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
AIMEE LOUISE AYRES B SC HONS | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richard Malam | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JILLIAN SARAH LEONARD MBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Len Stevens | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev IAN KAY MONKS BAHONSPGCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM RICHARD LEONARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.59k | £107.04k | £98.61k | £117.22k | £202.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.81k | £94.52k | £80.18k | £106.46k | £236.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEN STEVENS
13 MIDDLE GREEN
DODDINGHURST
CM15 0QT
- Phone:
- 02085908815
- Email:
- Lenstevens9@aol.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window