Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CLAYGATE
Charity number: 1128476

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Patrick John Bateman | Chair | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Linney | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Monica Beatrice Bennett | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Matthew Polwin | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adrian John Graham-Smith | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Llewelyn Toyn | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Hamper | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Hazel Hall | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Katherine Trenna Miller | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robi Sol Elsawey | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Alexander Smith | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Evenden Matthews | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Jane Reeve | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judy Madavo MBA | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Marion Watkins | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Simon Tanner | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Kenneth Chapman | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Shine MB BS | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clifton | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Anne Schmidt | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew Reid | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN HOWELLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN PRESTON CAMERON SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.