Financial history CHESHIRE EAST CAB LTD

Charity number: 1128498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £747.77k £802.00k £753.84k £719.38k £732.87k
Total expenditure £794.19k £811.70k £749.88k £748.71k £738.05k
Income from government contracts £284.68k £277.00k £277.00k £318.23k £277.00k
Income from government grants £308.87k £332.75k £391.15k £315.89k £93.42k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.24k £8.70k £13.23k £5.58k £178
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £737.13k £793.03k £740.40k £712.79k £729.40k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £402 £262 £215 £1.01k £3.29k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £794.19k £811.70k £749.88k £748.71k £738.05k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.18k £3.24k £3.48k £3.64k £3.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0