Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST THOMAS A BECKET, WARBLINGTON WITH ST JAMES, EMSWORTH
Charity number: 1128391

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Frank Sheard | Chair | 25 February 2018 |
|
|||||
DENNIS IAN CHANDLER | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Christopher John Barrett | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Warnock | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Broadhurst Habershon | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Edmund Bolt | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Bruce Maclaren Watson | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Eberle CBE | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Verena Jury | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
FREDA MADELEINE COX | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Anthony Charles Hines | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Toni Pearl Tredray | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dan Robinson | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Julie Elizabeth Price | Trustee | 14 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Jane Keeping | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.