THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT ANDREW, COLYTON, DEVON.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The work and activities of St Andrews, Colyton and St Michaels, Colyford as part of the Honiton Deanery in Exeter Diocese and the Church of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
191 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 08 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. ANDREW'S PCC, COLYTON. (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Mary Brooks | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Gladys Long | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Dauncey | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Steven Edward Martin | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Gay Bremridge | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James White | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE OLIVE PARRY SANSOM | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Angela Sansom | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS VICTORIA MILLS | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.76k | £210.28k | £161.52k | £168.52k | £233.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.74k | £175.29k | £148.83k | £173.63k | £220.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.25k | £8.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Office
The Sunday School Building
Market Place
COLYTON
Devon
EX24 6JS
- Phone:
- 01297 552307
- Email:
- office@holyford.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window