THE ROTARY CLUB OF DAWLISH WATER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising activities to raise funds so that we can make donations to needy organisations which we consider are deserving.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 25 August 2009: Standard registration
- THE ROTARY CLUB OF DAWLISH WATER (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAY MOORE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christopher White | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hayes | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin George Yair Buchanan | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gibbs | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ray Williams | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.08k | £6.70k | £12.10k | £14.04k | £12.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.20k | £6.15k | £10.51k | £13.51k | £12.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 DECEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 21 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO RAISE FUNDS FOR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL NEEDY ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS THAT WE CONSIDER ARE DESERVING
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 West Cliff Park Drive
DAWLISH
Devon
EX7 9EL
- Phone:
- 01626866205
- Email:
- rgybuchanan@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window