LOCKS HEATH FREE CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
2 Sunday services. Activities for children aged 0-18 throughout week. Parent & Toddler group. Small groups for adults. Mission abroad and UK inc. supporting missions in Ukraine and Greece. Schools work. Community projects. Messy Church and Holiday Club for children. Alpha Course. Seniors work. Debt counselling. Parenting Courses. Marriage Course.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 11 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 28 February 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 28 February 2019: Funds transferred to 1168433 Waypoint
- LHFC (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £387.39k | £557.22k | £785.90k | £622.83k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £303.90k | £302.48k | £310.17k | £327.28k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £510.28k | £737.45k | £579.65k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £29.93k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £33.90k | £35.30k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £13.04k | £13.15k | £13.25k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £294.88k | £301.28k | £323.68k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £5.50k | £5.00k | £2.16k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £2.10k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £3.89k | £3.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 05 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 21 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 21 July 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 13 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 06 July 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window