Financial history AGE UK NORTH YORKSHIRE AND DARLINGTON

Charity number: 1128377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £798.32k £927.72k £324.13k £600.63k £900.70k
Total expenditure £954.31k £816.98k £641.12k £609.74k £600.01k
Income from government contracts £143.20k £182.01k £104.08k £165.84k £146.37k
Income from government grants N/A £138.59k £104.08k £8.75k £4.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £79.28k £33.95k N/A £128.63k £349.46k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £117.40k N/A £10.27k £0
Income - Charitable activities £631.27k £775.05k N/A £456.10k £501.52k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £87.62k £1.32k N/A £13.10k £906
Income - Other £156 £0 N/A £0 £13.55k
Income - Legacies £56.32k £8.45k N/A £109.13k £280.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £868.24k £699.58k N/A £551.14k £600.01k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £117.40k N/A £58.60k £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.56k £6.80k N/A £5.26k £7.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £86.06k £0 N/A £0 £0