THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT SIMON, SOUTHSEA.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Personal growth through short courses, home groups and mentoring. Youth and children's activities. Parent Network. Care for sick, elderly and vulnerable. Sunday Supper - support for homeless and marginalized. Supporting a range of charities in UK and worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 20 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST.SIMON'S PCC, SOUTHSEA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Geary | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||
John Twine | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jacqueline Ann Twine | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Francis Gower | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Linda Jenkins | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Cllr. Hugh Laurence Mason | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elly Mulvany | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK CLARK JOLLY | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Louise Sara Roulston-Thomas | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Sherren | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Glyn Jenkins | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Brown | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oyinlolu Alonge | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.37k | £117.00k | £176.59k | £156.50k | £212.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.25k | £128.00k | £125.83k | £187.73k | £191.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 December 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 December 2021 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Simons Church
Waverley Road
Southsea
PO5 2PW
- Phone:
- 02392829440
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window