THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH AUGHTON, LANCASHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities Providing facilities for religious and community activities Providing financial and/or practical help to some organisations and individuals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 07 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CHRIST CHURCH AUGHTON PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Graham Rutter | Trustee | 03 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Sharples | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr LAURENCE ABERNETHY | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Margaret Harrison | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Ann Taylor | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Lock | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Burke | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Graham Stewart | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Rankin | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David George Cobbold | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Koogjie | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Patterson | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Critchley | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOE JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £460.51k | £455.51k | £259.28k | £404.12k | £285.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £306.53k | £306.53k | £298.04k | £272.93k | £311.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christchurch Ministry Centre
Long Lane
Aughton
ORMSKIRK
L39 5AS
- Phone:
- 01695424730
- Website:
-
christchurchaughton.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window