FRESHFORD PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Freshford Pre-school is based at Freshford Memorial Hall, Freshford near Bath. We offer sessional day care for children aged between 2 and 5 years, during term times only. We are eligible to receive the nursery education grant for children up to statutory school age. We are managed by an annually elected voluntary committee made up of parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 03 June 2009: Standard registration
- 04 April 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 04 April 2014: Funds transferred to 1153406 FRESHFORD PRE-SCHOOL
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.56k | £53.11k | £49.88k | £55.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.08k | £42.92k | £45.54k | £49.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 19 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 19 November 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 15 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 15 November 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 05 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 24 November 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 18 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 11 October 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 21/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 01/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2011 AS AMENDED ON 16/07/2013
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES. PARENTS WILL HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF THE PRE-SCHOOL. THE PRE-SCHOOL WILL OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window