Accounts and annual returns CHORLEY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1128897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window