Trustees CHORLEY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Charity number: 1128897

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Grahame Barkby | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Pat Holgate | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian McKendrick | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Mawdesley | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcia Pendlebury | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
REES BALLARD | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL BROWN | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Hodson | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Phillips | Trustee | 23 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN DARBYSHIRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS YVONNE BARKBY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.