CHRISTCHURCH SHEPSHED METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious worship, the provision of space for community activities and support to the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 03 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CHRISTCHURCH METHODIST CHURCH SHEPSHED (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Karen Beecham | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Rosemary Grimley | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Victoria Merrill | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Katy Brookes-Duncan | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Martin Swan | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Popley | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Cutts | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
REGINA LYNN HOBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Steve Price | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Michelle Price | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE DOBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Alan Hobson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Gladys Watret | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAWN FRANCES SCOTT | Trustee |
|
||||||
IAN ALEXANDER SCOTT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.57k | £56.49k | £37.23k | £69.65k | £47.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.67k | £46.81k | £37.91k | £53.55k | £47.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 July 2020 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 July 2020 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christchurch Methodist Church
Field Street
Shepshed
LOUGHBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE12 9AL
- Phone:
- 01509504243
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window